THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:07:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George Polemidiotis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Polemidiotis (CPSO#: 67955 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George Polemidiotis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Polemidiotis (CPSO#: 67955 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
09 Sep 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 09 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from September 9, 2022, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. George John Polemidiotis in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Polemidiotis to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. GEORGE JOHN POLEMIDIOTIS
(Dr. Polemidiotis)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE
(1) In this Undertaking:
“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;
“ICR Committee” means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;
“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.
(2) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, certificate of registration number 67955, am a member of the College.
(3) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge that I am the subject of College investigations bearing File Numbers CAS-129865-Y3C7X2 (formerly 1116248), CAS-128145-P1F0R4 (formerly 1116770), CAS-128768-G5C4L2 (formerly 1116426), CAS-128682-X2X0G3 (formerly 1116428), CAS-135708-T5H3L1 (formerly 1114566), CAS-128421-C1T9F4 (formerly 1116235), CAS-128541-C0R6W8 (formerly 1116361) and CAS-129795-K5K1C1 (formerly 1116182) (the “Investigations”) relating to my care of, and conduct towards, patients in my family medicine practice, and whether I engaged in professional misconduct, including inappropriate sexual conduct. I further acknowledge that I have been charged with multiple counts of Sexual Assault under section 271 of the Criminal Code.
(4) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge that I signed an undertaking with the College on September 27, 2021 (the “2021 Undertaking”), and acknowledge that this Undertaking, once signed, replaces the 2021 Undertaking.
(5) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge that the College has accepted this Undertaking in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at this time.
(6) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the ICR Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with the Code.
(7) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force until the matters currently being investigated are disposed of by a panel of the ICR Committee or the Discipline Tribunal.
B. UNDERTAKING AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
(8) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.
(9) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, undertake that I will not practise medicine in any jurisdiction until the following conditions have been met:
(a) the matters currently referred to the Discipline Tribunal of the College (“Discipline Tribunal”) are disposed of by a panel of the Discipline Tribunal; or
(b) I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days notice to the College of my intent to return to the practice of medicine.
(10) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge that when it receives my request to return to practice, the ICR Committee will recommence its process of considering restrictions under s. 25.4 of the Code, and will reconvene to consider making an interim order restricting or suspending my practice under s. 25.4.
(11) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal.
(12) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge that, in the event of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal and in the event of an appeal of any order of the Discipline Tribunal, if the Discipline Tribunal has directed the Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my certificate of registration, that order will take effect immediately despite any appeal.
(13) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
(14) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.
(15) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking, and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
(16) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.
(17) Public Register
(a) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
(b) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (17)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
Dr. Polemidiotis is the subject of College investigations, including investigations arising from public complaints and following charges being laid against Dr. Polemidiotis under the Criminal Code of Canada. During the investigations and in the event of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal, Dr. Polemidiotis must not practice medicine in any jurisdiction until the matters are disposed of by a panel of the ICR Committee or of the Discipline Tribunal, or upon a minimum of forty-five (45) days’ notice to the College of Dr. Polemidiotis’ intent to return to the practice of medicine, upon which the College may take interim action.
D. CONSENT
(18) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
(19) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “A”.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from September 9, 2022, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. George John Polemidiotis in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Polemidiotis to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. GEORGE JOHN POLEMIDIOTIS
(Dr. Polemidiotis)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE
(1) In this Undertaking:
“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;
“ICR Committee” means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;
“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.
(2) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, certificate of registration number 67955, am a member of the College.
(3) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge that I am the subject of College investigations bearing File Numbers CAS-129865-Y3C7X2 (formerly 1116248), CAS-128145-P1F0R4 (formerly 1116770), CAS-128768-G5C4L2 (formerly 1116426), CAS-128682-X2X0G3 (formerly 1116428), CAS-135708-T5H3L1 (formerly 1114566), CAS-128421-C1T9F4 (formerly 1116235), CAS-128541-C0R6W8 (formerly 1116361) and CAS-129795-K5K1C1 (formerly 1116182) (the “Investigations”) relating to my care of, and conduct towards, patients in my family medicine practice, and whether I engaged in professional misconduct, including inappropriate sexual conduct. I further acknowledge that I have been charged with multiple counts of Sexual Assault under section 271 of the Criminal Code.
(4) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge that I signed an undertaking with the College on September 27, 2021 (the “2021 Undertaking”), and acknowledge that this Undertaking, once signed, replaces the 2021 Undertaking.
(5) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge that the College has accepted this Undertaking in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at this time.
(6) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the ICR Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with the Code.
(7) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force until the matters currently being investigated are disposed of by a panel of the ICR Committee or the Discipline Tribunal.
B. UNDERTAKING AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
(8) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.
(9) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, undertake that I will not practise medicine in any jurisdiction until the following conditions have been met:
(a) the matters currently referred to the Discipline Tribunal of the College (“Discipline Tribunal”) are disposed of by a panel of the Discipline Tribunal; or
(b) I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days notice to the College of my intent to return to the practice of medicine.
(10) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge that when it receives my request to return to practice, the ICR Committee will recommence its process of considering restrictions under s. 25.4 of the Code, and will reconvene to consider making an interim order restricting or suspending my practice under s. 25.4.
(11) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal.
(12) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge that, in the event of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal and in the event of an appeal of any order of the Discipline Tribunal, if the Discipline Tribunal has directed the Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my certificate of registration, that order will take effect immediately despite any appeal.
(13) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
(14) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.
(15) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking, and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
(16) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.
(17) Public Register
(a) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
(b) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (17)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
Dr. Polemidiotis is the subject of College investigations, including investigations arising from public complaints and following charges being laid against Dr. Polemidiotis under the Criminal Code of Canada. During the investigations and in the event of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal, Dr. Polemidiotis must not practice medicine in any jurisdiction until the matters are disposed of by a panel of the ICR Committee or of the Discipline Tribunal, or upon a minimum of forty-five (45) days’ notice to the College of Dr. Polemidiotis’ intent to return to the practice of medicine, upon which the College may take interim action.
D. CONSENT
(18) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
(19) I, Dr. Polemidiotis, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “A”.

Current Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Proceeding Type: Discipline referral to OPSDT
Date of Referral or Application: 10 Feb 2021
Hearing Date(s): Merits; June 3, 2025
Summary:
Allegations of Dr. Polemidiotis’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that Dr. Polemidiotis engaged in sexual abuse and/or disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in respect of patients, including by touching a patient in sexual and/or inappropriate manner; engaging in sexual and/or inappropriate behaviour/harassment with a patient; violating appropriate doctor-patient and/or workplace boundaries with a patient; and/or making sexual and/or inappropriate remarks towards patients.
 
It is also alleged that Dr. Polemidiotis was found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise. It is further alleged that Dr. Polemidiotis engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and conduct unbecoming a physician based on the conduct underlying the criminal charges and conviction.
For more details please visit the OPSDT website

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (4)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 01 May 2023
Summary:
Findings of Guilt

George John Polemidiotis was found guilty of the following offences:
1. 3 counts of Sexual Assault contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date: May 1, 2023

SENTENCE: December 19, 2023

• 3.5 years Imprisonment, to be served concurrently
• Victim Surcharge of $600 
• 10 year prohibition on possession of weapons (s. 109 Criminal Code)
• DNA Order
• Order to comply with SOIRA (Sex Offender Information Registry Act) for 20 years
 
APPEAL
Dr. Polemidiotis appealed the decision. The Ontario Court of Appeal dismissed the appeal on December 17, 2024


Source: Other
Effective Date: 09 Dec 2022
Summary:
Charges

Georgios Polemidiotis was charged with the following offences:

1.  Three counts of sexual assault, between January 1, 2011 and August 31, 2021, contrary to section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of Charge:  December 9, 2022 
Place of Charge: Newmarket 
York Regional Police


Source: Other
Effective Date: 07 Dec 2022
Summary:
Bail Conditions

On December 7, 2022, the following Conditions of Release (Bail Conditions) were imposed on Georgios Polemidiotis:

1.  Polemidiotis must notify specified police officer of any change to his address or employment.
 
2.  Polemidiotis must not communicate, directly or indirectly, with specified person.
 
3.  Polemidiotis must not go to any residence, place of employment, doctor’s office, or anywhere specified person might reasonably be.
 
4.  Polemidiotis must not possess a firearm, crossbow, prohibited weapon, restricted weapon, prohibited device, ammunition, prohibited ammunition or explosive substance, and must surrender those that are in his possession and also any authorization, licence or registration certificate or other document enabling him to acquire or possess them.
 
5.  Polemidiotis must not publish, broadcast, or transmit and not cause or permit publication, broadcasting, or transmission in any way, any information that could identify the victim(s) or witness(es) specified.
 
6.  Polemidiotis must continue to abide by any current release conditions he is currently bound by.


Source: Member
Effective Date: 09 Sep 2022
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. George John Polemidiotis to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 9, 2022:
 
Dr. Polemidiotis is the subject of College investigations, including investigations arising from public complaints and following charges being laid against Dr. Polemidiotis under the Criminal Code of Canada. During the investigations and in the event of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal, Dr. Polemidiotis must not practice medicine in any jurisdiction until the matters are disposed of by a panel of the ICR Committee or of the Discipline Tribunal, or upon a minimum of forty-five (45) days’ notice to the College of Dr. Polemidiotis’ intent to return to the practice of medicine, upon which the College may take interim action.
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Proceeding Type: Discipline referral to OPSDT
Date of Referral or Application: 10 Feb 2021
Hearing Date(s): Merits; June 3, 2025
Summary:
Allegations of Dr. Polemidiotis’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that Dr. Polemidiotis engaged in sexual abuse and/or disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in respect of patients, including by touching a patient in sexual and/or inappropriate manner; engaging in sexual and/or inappropriate behaviour/harassment with a patient; violating appropriate doctor-patient and/or workplace boundaries with a patient; and/or making sexual and/or inappropriate remarks towards patients.
 
It is also alleged that Dr. Polemidiotis was found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise. It is further alleged that Dr. Polemidiotis engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and conduct unbecoming a physician based on the conduct underlying the criminal charges and conviction.
For more details please visit the OPSDT website

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (4)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 01 May 2023
Summary:
Findings of Guilt

George John Polemidiotis was found guilty of the following offences:
1. 3 counts of Sexual Assault contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date: May 1, 2023

SENTENCE: December 19, 2023

• 3.5 years Imprisonment, to be served concurrently
• Victim Surcharge of $600 
• 10 year prohibition on possession of weapons (s. 109 Criminal Code)
• DNA Order
• Order to comply with SOIRA (Sex Offender Information Registry Act) for 20 years
 
APPEAL
Dr. Polemidiotis appealed the decision. The Ontario Court of Appeal dismissed the appeal on December 17, 2024


Source: Other
Effective Date: 09 Dec 2022
Summary:
Charges

Georgios Polemidiotis was charged with the following offences:

1.  Three counts of sexual assault, between January 1, 2011 and August 31, 2021, contrary to section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of Charge:  December 9, 2022 
Place of Charge: Newmarket 
York Regional Police


Source: Other
Effective Date: 07 Dec 2022
Summary:
Bail Conditions

On December 7, 2022, the following Conditions of Release (Bail Conditions) were imposed on Georgios Polemidiotis:

1.  Polemidiotis must notify specified police officer of any change to his address or employment.
 
2.  Polemidiotis must not communicate, directly or indirectly, with specified person.
 
3.  Polemidiotis must not go to any residence, place of employment, doctor’s office, or anywhere specified person might reasonably be.
 
4.  Polemidiotis must not possess a firearm, crossbow, prohibited weapon, restricted weapon, prohibited device, ammunition, prohibited ammunition or explosive substance, and must surrender those that are in his possession and also any authorization, licence or registration certificate or other document enabling him to acquire or possess them.
 
5.  Polemidiotis must not publish, broadcast, or transmit and not cause or permit publication, broadcasting, or transmission in any way, any information that could identify the victim(s) or witness(es) specified.
 
6.  Polemidiotis must continue to abide by any current release conditions he is currently bound by.


Source: Member
Effective Date: 09 Sep 2022
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. George John Polemidiotis to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 9, 2022:
 
Dr. Polemidiotis is the subject of College investigations, including investigations arising from public complaints and following charges being laid against Dr. Polemidiotis under the Criminal Code of Canada. During the investigations and in the event of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal, Dr. Polemidiotis must not practice medicine in any jurisdiction until the matters are disposed of by a panel of the ICR Committee or of the Discipline Tribunal, or upon a minimum of forty-five (45) days’ notice to the College of Dr. Polemidiotis’ intent to return to the practice of medicine, upon which the College may take interim action.
 

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 09 Sep 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994