THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:38:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: (613) 721-4706
Address: Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Radiology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 16 May 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 16 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Markian Shulakewych Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Jan 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: (613) 721-4706
Address: Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Radiology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 16 May 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 16 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Markian Shulakewych Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Jan 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARKIAN OLEH SHULAKEWYCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHULAKEWYCH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARKIAN OLEH SHULAKEWYCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHULAKEWYCH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Nov 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 1998

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994