THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:41:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: WAYPOINT CENTRE FOR MENTAL HEALTH
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene Ontario L0K 1P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 549-3181
Extension: 2902
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Georgian Bay General Hospital Penetanguishene Site Penetanguishene
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital Penetanguishene Site
LOCATION: Penetanguishene

HOSPITAL: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
LOCATION: Penetanguishene

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: WAYPOINT CENTRE FOR MENTAL HEALTH
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene Ontario L0K 1P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 549-3181
Extension: 2902
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Georgian Bay General Hospital Penetanguishene Site Penetanguishene
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital Penetanguishene Site
LOCATION: Penetanguishene

HOSPITAL: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
LOCATION: Penetanguishene

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONALD IRWIN GARDINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARDINER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONALD IRWIN GARDINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARDINER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994