THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:05:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 404
71 King St. West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 273-3636
Fax: (905) 273-9881

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Dr. Adamo
Grand Park Medical
Suite 208
719 Central Parkway West
Mississauga, Ontario
L5B 4L1
Tel: (905) 270-3636
Fax: (905) 270-8881
Date Received: 13 Mar 2012

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John E. Esmond Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Sep 2011

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 404
71 King St. West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 273-3636
Fax: (905) 273-9881

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Dr. Adamo
Grand Park Medical
Suite 208
719 Central Parkway West
Mississauga, Ontario
L5B 4L1
Tel: (905) 270-3636
Fax: (905) 270-8881
Date Received: 13 Mar 2012

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John E. Esmond Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Sep 2011

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Discipline Committee
18 Dec 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Discipline Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 18 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from 11:59 p.m., December 18, 2015, by order of the Discipline Committee of
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
by Dr. John Edward Esmond:

(a) Dr. Esmond shall not issue new prescriptions or renew existing
prescriptions for any of the following substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food
and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);

(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made
under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
as Schedule "A"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
hereto as Schedule "B")

(v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety
and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in Schedule
"C").

(b) Dr. Esmond shall post a sign that is clearly visible upon entering his
office(s) in the form set out at Schedule "D". For further clarity, this
sign shall state as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Esmond must not prescribe any of the following:

* Narcotic Drugs
* Narcotic Preparations
* Controlled Drugs
* Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
* All other Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and
Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca

A sign reflecting this restriction will also be posted in Spanish.

(c) Dr. Esmond shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice
and patient charts and such other steps as the College may take for the
purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this
Order and will make his Ontario Health Insurance Plan billings and
Narcotics Monitoring System data accessible to the College for this
purpose.

(d) Dr. Esmond must successfully complete, at his own expense, the first
available Professional Boundaries and Ethics ("ProBE") Canada course and
University of Toronto Medical Record Keeping course, or, if these courses
are unavailable, other courses acceptable to the College in ethics,
boundaries, and medical record keeping, within four (4) months of the
date of this Order.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from 11:59 p.m., December 18, 2015, by order of the Discipline Committee of
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
by Dr. John Edward Esmond:

(a) Dr. Esmond shall not issue new prescriptions or renew existing
prescriptions for any of the following substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food
and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);

(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made
under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
as Schedule "A"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
hereto as Schedule "B")

(v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety
and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in Schedule
"C").

(b) Dr. Esmond shall post a sign that is clearly visible upon entering his
office(s) in the form set out at Schedule "D". For further clarity, this
sign shall state as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Esmond must not prescribe any of the following:

* Narcotic Drugs
* Narcotic Preparations
* Controlled Drugs
* Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
* All other Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and
Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca

A sign reflecting this restriction will also be posted in Spanish.

(c) Dr. Esmond shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice
and patient charts and such other steps as the College may take for the
purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this
Order and will make his Ontario Health Insurance Plan billings and
Narcotics Monitoring System data accessible to the College for this
purpose.

(d) Dr. Esmond must successfully complete, at his own expense, the first
available Professional Boundaries and Ethics ("ProBE") Canada course and
University of Toronto Medical Record Keeping course, or, if these courses
are unavailable, other courses acceptable to the College in ethics,
boundaries, and medical record keeping, within four (4) months of the
date of this Order.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 18 Dec 2015
Summary of Decision:
On December 18, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Esmond committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Esmond admitted to the allegations.

On July 31, 2013, the College received a letter from the Office of the Chief Coroner notifying the College of the death of a patient of Dr. Esmond. The Coroner raised concerns with respect to the care provided by Dr. Esmond, including the dose of morphine prescribed prior to the patient’s death. This information led the College to initiate an investigation into Dr. Esmond’s practice.

The College retained a Medical Inspector, Dr. X as part of its investigation. Dr. X found that Dr. Esmond failed to meet the standard of practice in the care provided to 16 of the 36 patients whose charts were reviewed and one of seven patient encounters observed in Dr. Esmond’s office. Further, Dr. Esmond’s care exposed patients to risk of harm by “placing [them] in a situation of reliance on major analgesics for an undefined and indeterminate length of time.”

On May 20, 2014, after receiving Dr. X’s report, Dr. Esmond voluntarily entered into an undertaking relinquishing his privileges to prescribe narcotics, benzodiazepines and all other monitored drugs and controlled substances. Dr. Esmond also undertook to refer all patients on opioid therapy to other physicians for assessment and care. On February 12, 2015, following the referral of this matter to the Discipline Committee, Dr. Esmond signed an interim undertaking imposing substantially similar restrictions on his certificate of registration pending the hearing.

In addition, Dr. Esmond treated a family member between 2007 and 2014, acting as the family member’s primary care provider between 2007 and 2011, and following the family member for a number of serious medical conditions. In the course of treating his family member, Dr. Esmond made diagnoses, ordered investigations, made referrals to specialists, wrote prescriptions, including prescriptions for psychotropic medication, billed the Ontario Health Insurance Program (“OHIP”), and completed insurance forms. Some of Dr. Esmond’s treatment of his family member was not documented in his records or billed to OHIP. By treating his family member in this manner over the course of many years, Dr. Esmond acted in direct contravention of the College’s Policy on Treating Self and Family Members.

A second investigation into Dr. Esmond’s practice was commenced after the College received a third- party complaint alleging that Dr. Esmond had entered into a relationship with a physician whom he was a supervising, Dr. A, between February 2009 and March 2011. Dr. Esmond and Dr. A subsequently developed a personal and intimate relationship.

While acting as her supervisor, Dr. Esmond sought and received medical treatment from Dr. A on approximately 40 occasions for various conditions, including a burn to his hand and chronic back pain. In addition, Dr. A referred Dr. Esmond to a chiropractor, urologist, psychiatrist, nephrologist and a Physical Medicine specialist as well as prescribed various medications to him, completed a disability form for him, ordered a CT scan of his lumbar spine and ordered an MRI scan of his thoracic spine. Dr. Esmond continued to seek intermittent treatment from Dr. A following the conclusion of the period of supervision.

In addition, after the conclusion of the period of supervision, Dr. A completed an insurance assessment for Dr. Esmond which was submitted to his insurance company in support of his application for disability benefits.

Dr. Esmond also treated Dr. A during the period of supervision. Dr. Esmond continued to provide incidental treatment to Dr. A on occasion following the conclusion of the period of supervision, including ordering an ultrasound for Dr. A and referring Dr. A to a gynaecologist.
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
- the Registrar suspend Dr. Esmond’s certificate of registration for a period of four (4) months commencing immediately.
- the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Esmond’s certificate of registration:
(a) Dr. Esmond shall not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the following substances:
(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);
(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached [to the Order] as Schedule “A”; and the current regulatory lists are attached [to the Order] as Schedule “B”)
(v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in Schedule “C” [to the Order]).
(b) Dr. Esmond shall post a sign that is clearly visible upon entering his office(s) in the form set out at Schedule “D” [to the Order]. For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows:
IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Esmond must not prescribe any of the following:
Narcotic Drugs
- Narcotic Preparations
- Controlled Drugs
- Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
- All other Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca

A sign reflecting this restriction will also be posted in Spanish.
(c) Dr. Esmond shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and patient charts and such other steps as the College may take for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order and will make his Ontario Health Insurance Plan billings and Narcotics Monitoring System data accessible to the College for this purpose.
(d) Dr. Esmond must successfully complete, at his own expense, the first available Professional Boundaries and Ethics (“ProBE”) Canada course and University of Toronto Medical Record Keeping course, or, if these courses are unavailable, other courses acceptable to the College in ethics, boundaries, and medical record keeping, within four (4) months of the date of this Order.
- Dr. Esmond appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. Esmond pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460 within 30 days of the date of this Order.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): December 18, 2015

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 18 Dec 2015
Summary of Decision:
On December 18, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Esmond committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Esmond admitted to the allegations.

On July 31, 2013, the College received a letter from the Office of the Chief Coroner notifying the College of the death of a patient of Dr. Esmond. The Coroner raised concerns with respect to the care provided by Dr. Esmond, including the dose of morphine prescribed prior to the patient’s death. This information led the College to initiate an investigation into Dr. Esmond’s practice.

The College retained a Medical Inspector, Dr. X as part of its investigation. Dr. X found that Dr. Esmond failed to meet the standard of practice in the care provided to 16 of the 36 patients whose charts were reviewed and one of seven patient encounters observed in Dr. Esmond’s office. Further, Dr. Esmond’s care exposed patients to risk of harm by “placing [them] in a situation of reliance on major analgesics for an undefined and indeterminate length of time.”

On May 20, 2014, after receiving Dr. X’s report, Dr. Esmond voluntarily entered into an undertaking relinquishing his privileges to prescribe narcotics, benzodiazepines and all other monitored drugs and controlled substances. Dr. Esmond also undertook to refer all patients on opioid therapy to other physicians for assessment and care. On February 12, 2015, following the referral of this matter to the Discipline Committee, Dr. Esmond signed an interim undertaking imposing substantially similar restrictions on his certificate of registration pending the hearing.

In addition, Dr. Esmond treated a family member between 2007 and 2014, acting as the family member’s primary care provider between 2007 and 2011, and following the family member for a number of serious medical conditions. In the course of treating his family member, Dr. Esmond made diagnoses, ordered investigations, made referrals to specialists, wrote prescriptions, including prescriptions for psychotropic medication, billed the Ontario Health Insurance Program (“OHIP”), and completed insurance forms. Some of Dr. Esmond’s treatment of his family member was not documented in his records or billed to OHIP. By treating his family member in this manner over the course of many years, Dr. Esmond acted in direct contravention of the College’s Policy on Treating Self and Family Members.

A second investigation into Dr. Esmond’s practice was commenced after the College received a third- party complaint alleging that Dr. Esmond had entered into a relationship with a physician whom he was a supervising, Dr. A, between February 2009 and March 2011. Dr. Esmond and Dr. A subsequently developed a personal and intimate relationship.

While acting as her supervisor, Dr. Esmond sought and received medical treatment from Dr. A on approximately 40 occasions for various conditions, including a burn to his hand and chronic back pain. In addition, Dr. A referred Dr. Esmond to a chiropractor, urologist, psychiatrist, nephrologist and a Physical Medicine specialist as well as prescribed various medications to him, completed a disability form for him, ordered a CT scan of his lumbar spine and ordered an MRI scan of his thoracic spine. Dr. Esmond continued to seek intermittent treatment from Dr. A following the conclusion of the period of supervision.

In addition, after the conclusion of the period of supervision, Dr. A completed an insurance assessment for Dr. Esmond which was submitted to his insurance company in support of his application for disability benefits.

Dr. Esmond also treated Dr. A during the period of supervision. Dr. Esmond continued to provide incidental treatment to Dr. A on occasion following the conclusion of the period of supervision, including ordering an ultrasound for Dr. A and referring Dr. A to a gynaecologist.
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
- the Registrar suspend Dr. Esmond’s certificate of registration for a period of four (4) months commencing immediately.
- the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Esmond’s certificate of registration:
(a) Dr. Esmond shall not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the following substances:
(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);
(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached [to the Order] as Schedule “A”; and the current regulatory lists are attached [to the Order] as Schedule “B”)
(v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in Schedule “C” [to the Order]).
(b) Dr. Esmond shall post a sign that is clearly visible upon entering his office(s) in the form set out at Schedule “D” [to the Order]. For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows:
IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Esmond must not prescribe any of the following:
Narcotic Drugs
- Narcotic Preparations
- Controlled Drugs
- Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
- All other Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca

A sign reflecting this restriction will also be posted in Spanish.
(c) Dr. Esmond shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and patient charts and such other steps as the College may take for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order and will make his Ontario Health Insurance Plan billings and Narcotics Monitoring System data accessible to the College for this purpose.
(d) Dr. Esmond must successfully complete, at his own expense, the first available Professional Boundaries and Ethics (“ProBE”) Canada course and University of Toronto Medical Record Keeping course, or, if these courses are unavailable, other courses acceptable to the College in ethics, boundaries, and medical record keeping, within four (4) months of the date of this Order.
- Dr. Esmond appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. Esmond pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460 within 30 days of the date of this Order.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): December 18, 2015

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 18 Apr 2016
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 18 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee. Effective: 18 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 12 Feb 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 May 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 May 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 20 May 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994