THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:32:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4A-2200 Dundas St E
Mississauga ON L4X 2V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052320720
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5415 Dundas St W
Etobicoke ON M9B 1B5
Phone: 9052320720
Fax: 9052320790
Address: Unit 105A, 400 Dundas Street East
Mississauga Ontario L5A 1X5
Phone: 905-232-0720
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1980 Saint Clair Avenue West
Unit 203
Stockyards Medical
Toronto Ontario M6N 4X9
Phone: 416-901-9880
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1980 Saint Clair Avenue West
Unit 203
Toronto Ontario M6N 4X9
Phone: 416-901-9880
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 140 The Esplanade
Unit 4
Toronto Ontario M5A 4P5
Phone: 416-613-9155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3434 bienville blvd
ocean springs Mississippi United States 39564
Phone: 228-575-2180
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Mississippi

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4A-2200 Dundas St E
Mississauga ON L4X 2V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052320720
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5415 Dundas St W
Etobicoke ON M9B 1B5
Phone: 9052320720
Fax: 9052320790
Address: Unit 105A, 400 Dundas Street East
Mississauga Ontario L5A 1X5
Phone: 905-232-0720
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1980 Saint Clair Avenue West
Unit 203
Stockyards Medical
Toronto Ontario M6N 4X9
Phone: 416-901-9880
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1980 Saint Clair Avenue West
Unit 203
Toronto Ontario M6N 4X9
Phone: 416-901-9880
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 140 The Esplanade
Unit 4
Toronto Ontario M5A 4P5
Phone: 416-613-9155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3434 bienville blvd
ocean springs Mississippi United States 39564
Phone: 228-575-2180
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Mississippi

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANUS KULPA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KULPA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANUS KULPA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KULPA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 22 Oct 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 1997

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994