THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:18:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medical Oncology
Cross Cancer Institute
11560 University Avenue NW
Edmonton Alberta T6G 1Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (780) 432-8248
Fax: (780) 432-8888

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 09 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medical Oncology
Cross Cancer Institute
11560 University Avenue NW
Edmonton Alberta T6G 1Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (780) 432-8248
Fax: (780) 432-8888

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 09 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL BRUCE SAWYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAWYER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL BRUCE SAWYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAWYER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994