THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:54:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 9-2120 Regent Street
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 688 1359
Fax: 705 688 1422
Address: Suite 16
2140 Regent Street South
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5S8
Phone: 705-671-1575
Extension: 221
Fax: 705-671-2309

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharon Terada Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Apr 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 9-2120 Regent Street
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 688 1359
Fax: 705 688 1422
Address: Suite 16
2140 Regent Street South
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5S8
Phone: 705-671-1575
Extension: 221
Fax: 705-671-2309

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharon Terada Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Apr 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARON LEIGH TERADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TERADA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARON LEIGH TERADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TERADA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994