THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:16:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Bay Regional Hospital
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Jeys Business Record Storage & Mobile
871 Jet Ave
North Bay, ON P1B 2W9
Date Received: 04 May 2018

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hegge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Jun 2018

Corporation Name: The Hegge-McKinley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2008

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Bay Regional Hospital
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Jeys Business Record Storage & Mobile
871 Jet Ave
North Bay, ON P1B 2W9
Date Received: 04 May 2018

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hegge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Jun 2018

Corporation Name: The Hegge-McKinley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2008

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN GALE HEGGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEGGE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN GALE HEGGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEGGE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2022
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994