THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:37:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: Wei, Janice Fang Chin (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Wei, Janice Fang Chin (Used Until: 28 Jul 1999)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: York Medical
181 Green Lane East
Unit 2
East Gwillimbury Ontario L9N 0C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 868-9243
Fax: (905) 836-1597

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Wei, Janice Fang Chin (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Wei, Janice Fang Chin (Used Until: 28 Jul 1999)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: York Medical
181 Green Lane East
Unit 2
East Gwillimbury Ontario L9N 0C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 868-9243
Fax: (905) 836-1597

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANICE FANG CHIN LEA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANICE FANG CHIN LEA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994