THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:53:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Extension: 33200
Fax: (416) 907-3411
Address: Ornge Transport Medicine
5310 Explorer Drive
Mississauga Ontario L4W 5H8
Phone: (647) 428-2005
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5133
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 28 Jul 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 28 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health Whitby Site Whitby
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Sinai Health System Toronto
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Whitby Site
LOCATION: Whitby

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site
LOCATION: Port Perry

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Extension: 33200
Fax: (416) 907-3411
Address: Ornge Transport Medicine
5310 Explorer Drive
Mississauga Ontario L4W 5H8
Phone: (647) 428-2005
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5133
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 28 Jul 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 28 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health Whitby Site Whitby
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Sinai Health System Toronto
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Whitby Site
LOCATION: Whitby

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site
LOCATION: Port Perry

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RANDY STUART WAX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAX is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RANDY STUART WAX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAX is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994