THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:06:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1973
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For access and retrieval of medical records at previous practice at 701 Sheppard Avenue East, Toronto, Ontario from July 1, 1996 to July 31, 2016, contact: Records Management Ltd., 13 - 1 High Meadow Place, Toronto, Ontario, M9L 0A3. Telephone: 1-800-775-0093. Website: www.recordsregistry.ca

For access and retrieval of medical records at previous practice at Carefirst Family Health Team, 300 Silver Star Blvd, Scarborough, Ontario from January 15, 2017 to June 30, 2018, contact Carefirst Family Health Team. Telephone: 416 502-2029. Website: http://carefirstontario.ca/contact/
Date Received: 11 Jun 2018

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd.
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
1-800-775-0093
www.recordregistry.ca
Date Received: 05 Aug 2016

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd.
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Website: www.recordsregistry,ca
Date Received: 20 Jun 2016

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For access and retrieval of medical records at previous practice at 701 Sheppard Avenue East, Toronto, Ontario from July 1, 1996 to July 31, 2016, contact: Records Management Ltd., 13 - 1 High Meadow Place, Toronto, Ontario, M9L 0A3. Telephone: 1-800-775-0093. Website: www.recordsregistry.ca

For access and retrieval of medical records at previous practice at Carefirst Family Health Team, 300 Silver Star Blvd, Scarborough, Ontario from January 15, 2017 to June 30, 2018, contact Carefirst Family Health Team. Telephone: 416 502-2029. Website: http://carefirstontario.ca/contact/
Date Received: 11 Jun 2018

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd.
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
1-800-775-0093
www.recordregistry.ca
Date Received: 05 Aug 2016

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd.
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Website: www.recordsregistry,ca
Date Received: 20 Jun 2016

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 10 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994