THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:56:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.R. Prevost Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Apr 2015

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.R. Prevost Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Apr 2015

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 02 Feb 2015
Summary of Decision:
On February 2, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Prevost committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession with respect to 28 patients. The Committee also found that Dr. Prevost is incompetent in his practice of obstetrics and gynecology. Dr. Prevost admitted the allegations.

In response to concerns brought to the attention of the College, the College commenced an investigation into Dr. Prevost’s practice.

In the course of the College’s investigation, Dr. Prevost voluntarily entered into an Undertaking with the College signed January 23, 2013, to cease to prescribe Methotrexate and/or Misoprostol for the purpose of terminating pregnancies. Upon referral of the allegations to the Discipline Committee, Dr. Prevost entered into an Undertaking with the College signed November 20, 2013 in lieu of the imposition of an Order under s. 37 of the Health Professions Procedural Code to cease to practice obstetrics and gynecology.

A Medical Inspector retained by the College found that in his care and treatment of 28 patients, Dr. Prevost did not meet standard of practice of the profession and lacked knowledge, skill or judgment. The Medical Inspector identified a number of specific concerns pertaining to Dr. Prevost’s obstetrics and gynecology practice.

With respect to cases pertaining to medical terminations, Dr. Prevost’s care fell below the standard of practice of the profession in failing to comply with The Society of Obstetricians and Gynecologists of Canada Induced Abortion Guidelines (SOGC Guidelines). He displayed a lack of judgment and patients were exposed to harm or injury in his failure to properly screen patients for medical terminations, in his failure to calculate doses of Methotrexate on the basis of his patients’ respective body surface areas, and in his failure to follow up with patients including when he was aware that patients had on-going gestations after the administration of Methotrexate. In the cases of on-going gestations, the patients’ fetuses were exposed to risk of harm in that they were exposed to Methotrexate and Misoprostol. There were documented fetal abnormalities in two pregnancies that went to term. Whether or not the abnormalities were caused by the medications administered for the purpose of terminating the pregnancies was not the subject of the College’s investigation because it was not necessary for proof of the allegations set out in the Notice of Hearing.

Additionally, the Medical Inspector found Dr. Prevost breached the standard of practice of the profession and lacked judgment in the following areas:

a) obtaining weights and urine dips in his pre-natal patients;
b) charting pre-operatively and post-operatively;
c) obtaining or documenting informed consent;
d) obtaining appropriate pre-operative medical and/or anesthetic consults when indicated;
e) following up appropriately and in a timely manner in his gynecological and obstetrical practice; and
f) communicating with physician and nursing colleagues about his availability and/or lack of availability and/or when he was or was not taking responsibility for his patients who presented at or were admitted to hospital.

On February 2, 2015, Dr. Prevost signed an undertaking to resign from the College and not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practice medicine in Ontario. In addition, Dr. Prevost has undertaken never to practice obstetrics or gynecology in any jurisdiction.

Having regard to this Undertaking, the Committee ordered and directed that:
• Dr. Prevost attend before the panel to be reprimanded
• Dr. Prevost pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460 within 60 days of the date of this Order.
• The results of this proceeding be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): February 2, 2015

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Discipline
Effective Date: 02 Feb 2015
Summary: 1

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 02 Feb 2015
Summary of Decision:
On February 2, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Prevost committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession with respect to 28 patients. The Committee also found that Dr. Prevost is incompetent in his practice of obstetrics and gynecology. Dr. Prevost admitted the allegations.

In response to concerns brought to the attention of the College, the College commenced an investigation into Dr. Prevost’s practice.

In the course of the College’s investigation, Dr. Prevost voluntarily entered into an Undertaking with the College signed January 23, 2013, to cease to prescribe Methotrexate and/or Misoprostol for the purpose of terminating pregnancies. Upon referral of the allegations to the Discipline Committee, Dr. Prevost entered into an Undertaking with the College signed November 20, 2013 in lieu of the imposition of an Order under s. 37 of the Health Professions Procedural Code to cease to practice obstetrics and gynecology.

A Medical Inspector retained by the College found that in his care and treatment of 28 patients, Dr. Prevost did not meet standard of practice of the profession and lacked knowledge, skill or judgment. The Medical Inspector identified a number of specific concerns pertaining to Dr. Prevost’s obstetrics and gynecology practice.

With respect to cases pertaining to medical terminations, Dr. Prevost’s care fell below the standard of practice of the profession in failing to comply with The Society of Obstetricians and Gynecologists of Canada Induced Abortion Guidelines (SOGC Guidelines). He displayed a lack of judgment and patients were exposed to harm or injury in his failure to properly screen patients for medical terminations, in his failure to calculate doses of Methotrexate on the basis of his patients’ respective body surface areas, and in his failure to follow up with patients including when he was aware that patients had on-going gestations after the administration of Methotrexate. In the cases of on-going gestations, the patients’ fetuses were exposed to risk of harm in that they were exposed to Methotrexate and Misoprostol. There were documented fetal abnormalities in two pregnancies that went to term. Whether or not the abnormalities were caused by the medications administered for the purpose of terminating the pregnancies was not the subject of the College’s investigation because it was not necessary for proof of the allegations set out in the Notice of Hearing.

Additionally, the Medical Inspector found Dr. Prevost breached the standard of practice of the profession and lacked judgment in the following areas:

a) obtaining weights and urine dips in his pre-natal patients;
b) charting pre-operatively and post-operatively;
c) obtaining or documenting informed consent;
d) obtaining appropriate pre-operative medical and/or anesthetic consults when indicated;
e) following up appropriately and in a timely manner in his gynecological and obstetrical practice; and
f) communicating with physician and nursing colleagues about his availability and/or lack of availability and/or when he was or was not taking responsibility for his patients who presented at or were admitted to hospital.

On February 2, 2015, Dr. Prevost signed an undertaking to resign from the College and not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practice medicine in Ontario. In addition, Dr. Prevost has undertaken never to practice obstetrics or gynecology in any jurisdiction.

Having regard to this Undertaking, the Committee ordered and directed that:
• Dr. Prevost attend before the panel to be reprimanded
• Dr. Prevost pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460 within 60 days of the date of this Order.
• The results of this proceeding be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): February 2, 2015

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Discipline
Effective Date: 02 Feb 2015
Summary: 1

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 02 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 20 Nov 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994