THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:43:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: Ceolin-Wietfeldt, Sandra (Used Until: 14 Nov 2023) Ceolin, Sandra (Used Until: 22 Jul 1996)
Medical School: McMaster University, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thistlewood Professional Centre
8077 Islington Avenue
Suite 306
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 7X7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 856-8714
Fax: (905) 856-4036

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Nursing Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Nursing
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: Ceolin-Wietfeldt, Sandra (Used Until: 14 Nov 2023) Ceolin, Sandra (Used Until: 22 Jul 1996)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thistlewood Professional Centre
8077 Islington Avenue
Suite 306
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 7X7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 856-8714
Fax: (905) 856-4036

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Nursing Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Nursing
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDRA CEOLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CEOLIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDRA CEOLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CEOLIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994