THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 10:52:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2500 North State Street
Jackson Mississippi 39216
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6019846525
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ghana
USA - Mississippi

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Khristinn Kellie Leitch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2500 North State Street
Jackson Mississippi 39216
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6019846525
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ghana
USA - Mississippi

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Khristinn Kellie Leitch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KHRISTINN KELLIE LEITCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEITCH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KHRISTINN KELLIE LEITCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEITCH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994