THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:56:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1961
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical record requests should be sent to Dr. Manal Ekladious at 3850 Finch Avenue East, Scarborough, ON, M1T 3T6; 416 298 2988 (phone).
Date Received: 08 Aug 2022

Instructions/Address: DOCUdavit Solutions Inc
28 Eugene Street
Toronto, ON M6B 3Z4
Phone: 888-781-9083
Date Received: 03 May 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical record requests should be sent to Dr. Manal Ekladious at 3850 Finch Avenue East, Scarborough, ON, M1T 3T6; 416 298 2988 (phone).
Date Received: 08 Aug 2022

Instructions/Address: DOCUdavit Solutions Inc
28 Eugene Street
Toronto, ON M6B 3Z4
Phone: 888-781-9083
Date Received: 03 May 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 25 Jun 2012
Summary of Decision:
On June 25, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Magdy Messiha Hanna committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Discipline Committee also found that Dr. Hanna is incompetent. Dr. Hanna admitted the allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence.

Dr. Hanna practises family medicine in Scarborough, Ontario.

Dr. Hanna failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and is incompetent in his prescribing to 25 individuals without conducting an assessment, physical, or maintaining a chart.

Dr. Hanna failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care, treatment and/or medical record keeping in relation to the patients referenced in an expert report resulting from a College investigation.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. the Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Hanna's
Certificate of Registration:

(a) Dr. Hanna is prohibited from prescribing:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27); or

(iv) Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)

(A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached [to the Order] as Schedule "A"; and the current regulatory lists are attached [to the Order] as Schedule "B").

(v) Monitored Drugs (as noted in Schedule "C" [to the Order])
(b) Dr. Hanna shall post a clearly visible sign in his waiting room in the form set out at Schedule "D" [to the Order]. For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: "Dr. Hanna has relinquished his prescribing privileges with respect to Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and/or Other Targeted Substances and Monitored Drugs."
(c) Dr. Hanna will undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor, for six (6) months, who is acceptable to the College ("Clinical Supervisor") and who shall meet with him on a monthly basis and review 10 charts per month. Attached [to the Order] as Schedule "E" is a copy of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking.


(d) Within approximately one (1) year, Dr. Hanna shall undergo a re assessment of his clinical practice by a College-appointed assessor ("Assessor"). The Assessor shall report the results of this assessment to the College and Dr. Hanna shall abide by all recommendations made by the Assessor and the College.

(e) Dr. Hanna must successfully complete, at his own expense, College-facilitated instruction in Medical Ethics.

(f) Dr. Hanna shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and such other steps as the College may take for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of the Order, such as giving consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person or institution who may have relevant information in order for the College to monitor Dr. Hanna's compliance with this Order
.
2. Dr. Hanna appear before it to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand recorded on the register.

3. Dr. Hanna pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): June 25, 2012

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 25 Jun 2012
Summary of Decision:
On June 25, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Magdy Messiha Hanna committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Discipline Committee also found that Dr. Hanna is incompetent. Dr. Hanna admitted the allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence.

Dr. Hanna practises family medicine in Scarborough, Ontario.

Dr. Hanna failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and is incompetent in his prescribing to 25 individuals without conducting an assessment, physical, or maintaining a chart.

Dr. Hanna failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care, treatment and/or medical record keeping in relation to the patients referenced in an expert report resulting from a College investigation.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. the Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Hanna's
Certificate of Registration:

(a) Dr. Hanna is prohibited from prescribing:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27); or

(iv) Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)

(A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached [to the Order] as Schedule "A"; and the current regulatory lists are attached [to the Order] as Schedule "B").

(v) Monitored Drugs (as noted in Schedule "C" [to the Order])
(b) Dr. Hanna shall post a clearly visible sign in his waiting room in the form set out at Schedule "D" [to the Order]. For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: "Dr. Hanna has relinquished his prescribing privileges with respect to Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and/or Other Targeted Substances and Monitored Drugs."
(c) Dr. Hanna will undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor, for six (6) months, who is acceptable to the College ("Clinical Supervisor") and who shall meet with him on a monthly basis and review 10 charts per month. Attached [to the Order] as Schedule "E" is a copy of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking.


(d) Within approximately one (1) year, Dr. Hanna shall undergo a re assessment of his clinical practice by a College-appointed assessor ("Assessor"). The Assessor shall report the results of this assessment to the College and Dr. Hanna shall abide by all recommendations made by the Assessor and the College.

(e) Dr. Hanna must successfully complete, at his own expense, College-facilitated instruction in Medical Ethics.

(f) Dr. Hanna shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and such other steps as the College may take for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of the Order, such as giving consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person or institution who may have relevant information in order for the College to monitor Dr. Hanna's compliance with this Order
.
2. Dr. Hanna appear before it to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand recorded on the register.

3. Dr. Hanna pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): June 25, 2012

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1961

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 31 Jul 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994