THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:50:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Rio Grande Sul, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 01 Jul 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Rio Grande Sul, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 01 Jul 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Jul 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 01 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. JOAO LUIZ PIPPI SALLE may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery, Division of Urology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. SALLE holds an academic appointment at the rank of Full Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. SALLE no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. JOAO LUIZ PIPPI SALLE may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery, Division of Urology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. SALLE holds an academic appointment at the rank of Full Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. SALLE no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Rio Grande Sul, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 04 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 May 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Nov 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jul 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 May 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 May 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 1995