THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:18:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Occupational Health Department
General Motors of Canada
1908 Colonel Sam Drive
Oshawa Ontario L1H 8P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 644-3737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: University of Guelph
Occupational Health Dept
50 Stone Road
Guelph Ontario N1G 2W1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: toronto police services
wellness unit
40 college street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2J3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Occupational Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Occupational Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Occupational Health Department
General Motors of Canada
1908 Colonel Sam Drive
Oshawa Ontario L1H 8P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 644-3737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: University of Guelph
Occupational Health Dept
50 Stone Road
Guelph Ontario N1G 2W1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: toronto police services
wellness unit
40 college street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2J3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Occupational Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Occupational Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RONALD WADE DYKEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DYKEMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RONALD WADE DYKEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DYKEMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995