THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:27:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Montreal Road
Cornwall, Ontario
Cornwall Ontario K6H1C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 9338155
Fax: 6139358830
Address: Centre Ste Sante de l'Estrie
841 Sydney Street
Cornwall Ontario K6H 3T7
Phone: (613) 937-2683
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Bergeron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Dec 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Montreal Road
Cornwall, Ontario
Cornwall Ontario K6H1C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 9338155
Fax: 6139358830
Address: Centre Ste Sante de l'Estrie
841 Sydney Street
Cornwall Ontario K6H 3T7
Phone: (613) 937-2683
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Bergeron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Dec 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIERRE BERGERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERGERON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIERRE BERGERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERGERON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995