THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:52:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Chelsey Medical Clinic
P O Box 389
33 2nd Ave SE
Chesley Ontario N0G 1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 363-3220
Fax: (519) 363-0385
Address: SBGHC-Walkerton
1200 McGivern Street
Walkerton Ontario N0G2V0
Phone: 519-881-1220
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site
LOCATION: Chesley

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Chelsey Medical Clinic
P O Box 389
33 2nd Ave SE
Chesley Ontario N0G 1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 363-3220
Fax: (519) 363-0385
Address: SBGHC-Walkerton
1200 McGivern Street
Walkerton Ontario N0G2V0
Phone: 519-881-1220
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site
LOCATION: Chesley

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTINE MARIE SCHIPPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHIPPER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTINE MARIE SCHIPPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHIPPER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995