THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:54:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medical Oncology
Princess Margaret Hospital
700 University Avenue 7-724
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2399
Fax: (416) 946-6546

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 07 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer Knox Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Aug 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medical Oncology
Princess Margaret Hospital
700 University Avenue 7-724
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2399
Fax: (416) 946-6546

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 07 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer Knox Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Aug 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER JANE KNOX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNOX is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER JANE KNOX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNOX is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995