THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:43:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 750 Broadway W
Vancouver BC V5Z 1J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 604-872-5977
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 13750 96 Av
Surrey BC V3V 1Z2
Phone: 604-581-2211
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 750 West Broadway Av
Suite 806
Vancouver British Columbia V5Z 1J4
Phone: 604-872-5977
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 750 Broadway W
Vancouver BC V5Z 1J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 604-872-5977
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 13750 96 Av
Surrey BC V3V 1Z2
Phone: 604-581-2211
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 750 West Broadway Av
Suite 806
Vancouver British Columbia V5Z 1J4
Phone: 604-872-5977
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSS EVAN JOINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOINER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSS EVAN JOINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOINER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 02 Jun 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995