THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:42:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 1B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-773-7759
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 751 Victoria Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N4
Phone: 519-745-2273
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 385 Fairway Road South
Kitchener Ontario N2C 2N9
Phone: 519-748-2327
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Emergency Department
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Phone: 519-376-2121
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 340 High Street
Brightshores Health System - Southampton Hospital
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
Phone: 519-797-3230
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 1B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-773-7759
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 751 Victoria Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N4
Phone: 519-745-2273
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 385 Fairway Road South
Kitchener Ontario N2C 2N9
Phone: 519-748-2327
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Emergency Department
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Phone: 519-376-2121
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 340 High Street
Brightshores Health System - Southampton Hospital
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
Phone: 519-797-3230
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD WAYNE PILON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PILON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD WAYNE PILON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PILON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995