THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:26:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Requests for medical records can be directed to the Barrie FHO: 201 - 500 Huronia Road, Barrie, ON., L4N 8X3. Telephone: 705-503-5355.
Date Received: 13 Aug 2024

Instructions/Address: All patient records can be found in digital format on the shared Barrie FHO EMR.  Full access was passed on to the Physician who was recruited to take over Dr. McKee's practice.  Patients are free to access their records through the front desk at 201-500 Huronia Road.  With the patient's signed authorization others may also access their records.  A "fat client" system is used to call up one page at a time with all other existing data stored on the Accuro EMR servers in Toronto and British Columbia.  However, a patient's entire EMR can be easily downloaded on a digital device or disk. 
Date Received: 09 Mar 2023

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Finance United States of America
PROFESSION: Finance
JURISDICTION: United States of America

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John David McKee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 May 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Requests for medical records can be directed to the Barrie FHO: 201 - 500 Huronia Road, Barrie, ON., L4N 8X3. Telephone: 705-503-5355.
Date Received: 13 Aug 2024

Instructions/Address: All patient records can be found in digital format on the shared Barrie FHO EMR.  Full access was passed on to the Physician who was recruited to take over Dr. McKee's practice.  Patients are free to access their records through the front desk at 201-500 Huronia Road.  With the patient's signed authorization others may also access their records.  A "fat client" system is used to call up one page at a time with all other existing data stored on the Accuro EMR servers in Toronto and British Columbia.  However, a patient's entire EMR can be easily downloaded on a digital device or disk. 
Date Received: 09 Mar 2023

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Finance United States of America
PROFESSION: Finance
JURISDICTION: United States of America

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John David McKee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 May 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 10 Mar 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995