THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:17:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: Lacika-Cruickshanks, Sonia Maria (Used Until: 20 Sep 2001) Lacika, Sonia Maria (Used Until: 12 Jun 2000)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SLOVAK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 310-679 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 5G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058361600
Fax: 9058365712

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 Nov 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Lacika-Cruickshanks, Sonia Maria (Used Until: 20 Sep 2001) Lacika, Sonia Maria (Used Until: 12 Jun 2000)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SLOVAK
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 310-679 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 5G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058361600
Fax: 9058365712

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 Nov 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONIA MARIA CRUICKSHANKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRUICKSHANKS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONIA MARIA CRUICKSHANKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRUICKSHANKS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Dec 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2000

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2000

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995