THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:37:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Respirology
St. Michael's Hospital
Room 6-040
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-864-5409
Fax: 416-864-5650

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 17 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Respirology
St. Michael's Hospital
Room 6-040
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-864-5409
Fax: 416-864-5650

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 17 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE LOUISE STEPHENSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEPHENSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE LOUISE STEPHENSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEPHENSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995