THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:30:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Boniface Park Medical Centre
Unit 6
700 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 431-7100
Fax: (416) 431-7191
Address: Suite 402,
658 Danforth Ave
Toronto Ontario M4J 5B9
Phone: (416) 461-7461
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simmons Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Simmons (CPSO#: 69234 )
Business Address: Boniface Park Medical Centre
Unit 6
700 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2A7
(416) 431-7100
Business Address: Suite 402
658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 5B9
(416) 461-7461

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Boniface Park Medical Centre
Unit 6
700 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 431-7100
Fax: (416) 431-7191
Address: Suite 402,
658 Danforth Ave
Toronto Ontario M4J 5B9
Phone: (416) 461-7461
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simmons Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Simmons (CPSO#: 69234 )
Business Address: Boniface Park Medical Centre
Unit 6
700 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2A7
(416) 431-7100
Business Address: Suite 402
658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 5B9
(416) 461-7461

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAMELA ANGELICA SIMMONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMMONS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAMELA ANGELICA SIMMONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMMONS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995