THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:50:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 104
3328 McCarthy Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1V 0H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 526-5515
Fax: (613) 526-0740
Address: PO Box 819 Stn Main
Manotick ON K4M 1A7
Phone: 6136925433
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 104
3328 McCarthy Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1V 0H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 526-5515
Fax: (613) 526-0740
Address: PO Box 819 Stn Main
Manotick ON K4M 1A7
Phone: 6136925433
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Discipline Committee
16 May 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Discipline Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 16 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from June 7, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Chaut Khuon in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Khuon to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. CHAUT KHUON
("Dr. Khuon")

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")




A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
amended;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
public.

(2) I, Dr. Khuon, certificate of registration number 69326, am a member of
the College.

(3) I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
bearing File Number 7216070 (the "Investigation") into my practice of
emergency medicine.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Khuon, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
effective immediately.

(5) Practice Restrictions

(a) I, Dr. Khuon, undertake that I will not engage in any of the
following areas of practice:

(i) Emergency medicine in Ontario.

(b) I, Dr. Khuon, undertake that I will :

(i) Provide to the College a minimum of 120 days' notice if I
intend to resume my practice in emergency medicine;

(ii) Follow an Individualized Education Plan (IEP), as set out in
the IEP attached at Appendix "A";

(iii) Complete the next available CHEO (Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario) Annual Refresher Course in Paediatrics; and

(iv) Undergo a reassessment of my practice in respect of my
paediatric patients approximately one year following my
completion of the IEP,

(6) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Khuon, undertake to inform the College of each and every
location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
(5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further
undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
location.

(b) I, Dr. Khuon, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Khuon, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution
that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
form, attached hereto as Appendix "B".

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(7) I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(8) I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
so.

(10) I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

(11) I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
the Discipline Committee.

(12) I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(13) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the
following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Khuon's
practice of emergency medicine. As a result of the
investigation, Dr. Khuon must not practise emergency medicine
in Ontario.

D. CONSENT

(14) I, Dr. Khuon, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from June 7, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Chaut Khuon in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Khuon to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. CHAUT KHUON
("Dr. Khuon")

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")




A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
amended;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
public.

(2) I, Dr. Khuon, certificate of registration number 69326, am a member of
the College.

(3) I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
bearing File Number 7216070 (the "Investigation") into my practice of
emergency medicine.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Khuon, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
effective immediately.

(5) Practice Restrictions

(a) I, Dr. Khuon, undertake that I will not engage in any of the
following areas of practice:

(i) Emergency medicine in Ontario.

(b) I, Dr. Khuon, undertake that I will :

(i) Provide to the College a minimum of 120 days' notice if I
intend to resume my practice in emergency medicine;

(ii) Follow an Individualized Education Plan (IEP), as set out in
the IEP attached at Appendix "A";

(iii) Complete the next available CHEO (Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario) Annual Refresher Course in Paediatrics; and

(iv) Undergo a reassessment of my practice in respect of my
paediatric patients approximately one year following my
completion of the IEP,

(6) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Khuon, undertake to inform the College of each and every
location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
(5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further
undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
location.

(b) I, Dr. Khuon, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Khuon, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution
that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
form, attached hereto as Appendix "B".

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(7) I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(8) I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
so.

(10) I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

(11) I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
the Discipline Committee.

(12) I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(13) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Khuon, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the
following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Khuon's
practice of emergency medicine. As a result of the
investigation, Dr. Khuon must not practise emergency medicine
in Ontario.

D. CONSENT

(14) I, Dr. Khuon, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 17 Dec 2018
Summary of Decision:
On December 17, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Chaut Khuon committed an act of professional misconduct in that in that he engaged in acts or omissions relevant to the practice of medicine that would be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional by submitting inaccurate information to the College on his Annual Renewal Forms for 2014, 2015 and 2016, at the time he was the subject of inquiries into his care in Quebec.

Dr. Khuon is a family physician who received his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice in 2008. At the relevant times, Dr. Khuon practiced family medicine in Ottawa, Ontario and practiced emergency medicine at the Gatineau Hospital in Gatineau, Quebec.

On March 27, 2017, the Collège des Médecins du Québec (the CMQ) provided information to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the CPSO) regarding an inquiry conducted by the CMQ into Dr. Khuon. The inquiry by the CMQ resulted from a report by the Gatineau Hospital about four incidents involving Dr. Khuon’s care of two adults and two pediatric patients in the emergency department. The incidents took place between March 16, 2014 and December 5, 2014. The CMQ stated that Dr. Khuon was no longer registered as an active member of the CMQ.

Upon receipt of the letter from the CMQ dated March 27, 2017, the CPSO noted that Dr. Khuon had not disclosed on his Annual Renewal that he was registered with the CMQ. Dr. Khuon held an active certificate of registration in Quebec from 2000 to 2016.Dr. Khuon failed to declare that he was registered with the CMQ or that he held hospital privileges in Quebec on his Annual Renewals with the CPSO in 2014, 2015 and 2016. Prior to his Annual Renewal completed on May 9, 2014, Dr. Khuon had disclosed that he was registered with the CMQ on his Annual Renewals in 2010, 2011, 2012 and 2013.

Dr. Khuon’s failure to declare on his Annual Renewals that he was registered with the CMQ or had hospital privileges in Quebec coincided with the incidents at the Gatineau Hospital, and the inquiry into the incidents by the hospital and then the CMQ. Dr. Khuon resigned his privileges at the Gatineau Hospital in October 2015 and resigned from the CMQ in December 2016.

Facts Relevant to Penalty
On the basis of the information provided by the Collège des Médecins du Québec, the College conducted an investigation into Dr. Khuon’s practice in Ontario. The College retained an expert to opine on Dr. Khuon’s family medicine practice. Dr. Khuon was not practicing Emergency Medicine in Ontario. The expert reviewed 25 charts, interviewed Dr. Khuon, observed clinical encounters between Dr. Khuon and five patients at his office, and conducted a follow-up phone call with Dr. Khuon. The expert concluded that Dr. Khuon met the standard of practice of the profession, that Dr. Khuon did not display a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment, and that Dr. Khuon did not pose a risk of harm to patients

On June 7, 2018, Dr. Khuon entered into an Undertaking in lieu of the imposition of an Order pursuant to s. 25.4 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991 (the “Section 25.4 Undertaking”). The Section 25.4 Undertaking, which is in effect until the allegations referred to the Discipline Committee have been disposed of, provides that a Clinical Supervisor is to review all of Dr. Khuon’s pediatric patient charts every month and to report to the College on a quarterly basis.

The Clinical Supervisor has met with Dr. Khuon and reviewed all of his pediatric charts on a monthly basis as set out in the Section 25.4 Undertaking. The report to date from the Clinical Supervisor indicates that Dr. Khuon is practicing to an acceptable standard in his care of pediatric patients, with some recommendations having been made.

Also on June 7, 2018, Dr. Khuon entered into a second Undertaking with the College. In that second Undertaking, Dr. Khuon undertook that he:
- will not engage in the practice of Emergency Medicine in Ontario;
- will complete an Individualized Education Plan (IEP) for pediatric patients;
- will complete the next available CHEO Annual Refresher Course in Pediatrics; and
- will undergo a reassessment of his practice in respect of his pediatric patients approximately one year following his completion of the IEP.

Dr. Khuon completed the CHEO Annual Refresher Course in Pediatrics on November 9 and 10, 2018 and has completed the other components of the IEP. A reassessment of his practice in respect of his pediatric patients will accordingly take place in approximately one year. Dr. Khuon cooperated with the College in the course of its investigation.

Disposition

The Discipline Committee ordered that:
- The Registrar suspend Dr. Khuon’s certificate of registration for a period of two (2) months, commencing from December 31, 2018 at 12:01 a.m.
- The Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Khuon’s certificate of registration:
o Dr. Khuon will participate in and successfully complete, within 6 months of the date of this Order, individualized instruction in medical ethics with an instructor selected by the College, with a report or reports to be provided by the instructor to the College regarding Dr. Khuon’s progress and compliance.
- Dr. Khuon attend before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. Khuon pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within 30 days of the date of this Order.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): December 17, 2018 start time 1:00 p.m.

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 07 Jun 2018
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Chaut Khoun to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 7, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Khuon's practice of emergency medicine. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Khuon must not practise emergency medicine in Ontario.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 17 Dec 2018
Summary of Decision:
On December 17, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Chaut Khuon committed an act of professional misconduct in that in that he engaged in acts or omissions relevant to the practice of medicine that would be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional by submitting inaccurate information to the College on his Annual Renewal Forms for 2014, 2015 and 2016, at the time he was the subject of inquiries into his care in Quebec.

Dr. Khuon is a family physician who received his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice in 2008. At the relevant times, Dr. Khuon practiced family medicine in Ottawa, Ontario and practiced emergency medicine at the Gatineau Hospital in Gatineau, Quebec.

On March 27, 2017, the Collège des Médecins du Québec (the CMQ) provided information to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the CPSO) regarding an inquiry conducted by the CMQ into Dr. Khuon. The inquiry by the CMQ resulted from a report by the Gatineau Hospital about four incidents involving Dr. Khuon’s care of two adults and two pediatric patients in the emergency department. The incidents took place between March 16, 2014 and December 5, 2014. The CMQ stated that Dr. Khuon was no longer registered as an active member of the CMQ.

Upon receipt of the letter from the CMQ dated March 27, 2017, the CPSO noted that Dr. Khuon had not disclosed on his Annual Renewal that he was registered with the CMQ. Dr. Khuon held an active certificate of registration in Quebec from 2000 to 2016.Dr. Khuon failed to declare that he was registered with the CMQ or that he held hospital privileges in Quebec on his Annual Renewals with the CPSO in 2014, 2015 and 2016. Prior to his Annual Renewal completed on May 9, 2014, Dr. Khuon had disclosed that he was registered with the CMQ on his Annual Renewals in 2010, 2011, 2012 and 2013.

Dr. Khuon’s failure to declare on his Annual Renewals that he was registered with the CMQ or had hospital privileges in Quebec coincided with the incidents at the Gatineau Hospital, and the inquiry into the incidents by the hospital and then the CMQ. Dr. Khuon resigned his privileges at the Gatineau Hospital in October 2015 and resigned from the CMQ in December 2016.

Facts Relevant to Penalty
On the basis of the information provided by the Collège des Médecins du Québec, the College conducted an investigation into Dr. Khuon’s practice in Ontario. The College retained an expert to opine on Dr. Khuon’s family medicine practice. Dr. Khuon was not practicing Emergency Medicine in Ontario. The expert reviewed 25 charts, interviewed Dr. Khuon, observed clinical encounters between Dr. Khuon and five patients at his office, and conducted a follow-up phone call with Dr. Khuon. The expert concluded that Dr. Khuon met the standard of practice of the profession, that Dr. Khuon did not display a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment, and that Dr. Khuon did not pose a risk of harm to patients

On June 7, 2018, Dr. Khuon entered into an Undertaking in lieu of the imposition of an Order pursuant to s. 25.4 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991 (the “Section 25.4 Undertaking”). The Section 25.4 Undertaking, which is in effect until the allegations referred to the Discipline Committee have been disposed of, provides that a Clinical Supervisor is to review all of Dr. Khuon’s pediatric patient charts every month and to report to the College on a quarterly basis.

The Clinical Supervisor has met with Dr. Khuon and reviewed all of his pediatric charts on a monthly basis as set out in the Section 25.4 Undertaking. The report to date from the Clinical Supervisor indicates that Dr. Khuon is practicing to an acceptable standard in his care of pediatric patients, with some recommendations having been made.

Also on June 7, 2018, Dr. Khuon entered into a second Undertaking with the College. In that second Undertaking, Dr. Khuon undertook that he:
- will not engage in the practice of Emergency Medicine in Ontario;
- will complete an Individualized Education Plan (IEP) for pediatric patients;
- will complete the next available CHEO Annual Refresher Course in Pediatrics; and
- will undergo a reassessment of his practice in respect of his pediatric patients approximately one year following his completion of the IEP.

Dr. Khuon completed the CHEO Annual Refresher Course in Pediatrics on November 9 and 10, 2018 and has completed the other components of the IEP. A reassessment of his practice in respect of his pediatric patients will accordingly take place in approximately one year. Dr. Khuon cooperated with the College in the course of its investigation.

Disposition

The Discipline Committee ordered that:
- The Registrar suspend Dr. Khuon’s certificate of registration for a period of two (2) months, commencing from December 31, 2018 at 12:01 a.m.
- The Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Khuon’s certificate of registration:
o Dr. Khuon will participate in and successfully complete, within 6 months of the date of this Order, individualized instruction in medical ethics with an instructor selected by the College, with a report or reports to be provided by the instructor to the College regarding Dr. Khuon’s progress and compliance.
- Dr. Khuon attend before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. Khuon pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within 30 days of the date of this Order.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): December 17, 2018 start time 1:00 p.m.

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 07 Jun 2018
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Chaut Khoun to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 7, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Khuon's practice of emergency medicine. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Khuon must not practise emergency medicine in Ontario.

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 16 May 2019
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 28 Feb 2019
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee. Effective: 17 Dec 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Dec 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 16 May 2019

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2019

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Dec 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995