THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:38:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 705 Mackay St
Pembroke ON K8A 1G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 732 3675
Extension: 6178
Fax: 613 633 4598
Address: Base Medical Clinic
Canadain Forces Base Petawawa
Petawawa Ontario K8H 2X3
Phone: (613) 687-5511
Extension: 3746
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Thomas C. Hurley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 705 Mackay St
Pembroke ON K8A 1G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 732 3675
Extension: 6178
Fax: 613 633 4598
Address: Base Medical Clinic
Canadain Forces Base Petawawa
Petawawa Ontario K8H 2X3
Phone: (613) 687-5511
Extension: 3746
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Thomas C. Hurley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS CHARLES HURLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HURLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS CHARLES HURLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HURLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995