THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:05:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 302-1886 Oxford St W
London ON N6K 0J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5198581633
Fax: 5192861626

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hollohan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 May 2022

Corporation Name: Brown & Hollohan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Aug 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 302-1886 Oxford St W
London ON N6K 0J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5198581633
Fax: 5192861626

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hollohan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 May 2022

Corporation Name: Brown & Hollohan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Aug 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIRK GERARD HOLLOHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLOHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIRK GERARD HOLLOHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLOHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 18 Aug 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 1999

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995