THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:24:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: State Univ of New York at Buffalo, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Scarborough Hosp General Div
Department of Emergency Medicine
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 431-8200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Scarborough Hosp Birchmount Div
Department of Emergency Medicine
3030 Birchmuont Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Centenary Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: 4162848131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 10 Jan 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 10 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dubo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: State Univ of New York at Buffalo, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Scarborough Hosp General Div
Department of Emergency Medicine
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 431-8200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Scarborough Hosp Birchmount Div
Department of Emergency Medicine
3030 Birchmuont Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Centenary Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: 4162848131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 10 Jan 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 10 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dubo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
22 Oct 2012
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 22 2012
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Marc Loren Gelman may practise medicine independently in emergency
medicine, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Marc Loren Gelman may practise medicine independently in emergency
medicine, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: State Univ of New York at Buffalo, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Oct 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2012

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 1995