THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:47:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hospital For Sick Children
Suite M292
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-6899
Fax: (416) 813-6461

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 17 May 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
USA - Massachusetts
USA - Washington

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D.J. Bagli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bagli (CPSO#: 69530 )
Business Address: 555 University Ave.
Toronto Ontario M5G1X8
4168137500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hospital For Sick Children
Suite M292
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-6899
Fax: (416) 813-6461

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 17 May 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
USA - Massachusetts
USA - Washington

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D.J. Bagli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bagli (CPSO#: 69530 )
Business Address: 555 University Ave.
Toronto Ontario M5G1X8
4168137500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARIUS JEHAN BAGLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAGLI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARIUS JEHAN BAGLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAGLI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 May 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 May 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 1998

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 1998

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 May 1996
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 May 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 May 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 1995