THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:00:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 08 Nov 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 08 Nov 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1995
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 1995