THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:02:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie Ontario L4M 0H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057214422
Fax: 7057215577

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie Ontario L4M 0H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057214422
Fax: 7057215577

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRUCE MCCLELLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCLELLAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRUCE MCCLELLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCLELLAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 1995