THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:26:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Yonge Davis Centre
C 2 B
17480 Yonge Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 898-3700
Fax: (905) 898-3738

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. George P. Michael Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Oct 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Yonge Davis Centre
C 2 B
17480 Yonge Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 898-3700
Fax: (905) 898-3738

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. George P. Michael Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Oct 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE PHILLIP MICHAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MICHAEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE PHILLIP MICHAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MICHAEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 1995