THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:03:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical School, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Hematology / Oncology
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7758
Fax: (416) 813-5327

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical School, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Hematology / Oncology
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7758
Fax: (416) 813-5327

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YIGAL DROR may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DIVISION OF HEMATOLOGY/ONCOLOGY, THE HOSPITAL FOR SICK CHILDREN in which Dr. DROR holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. DROR may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. DROR no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. DROR no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. DROR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YIGAL DROR may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DIVISION OF HEMATOLOGY/ONCOLOGY, THE HOSPITAL FOR SICK CHILDREN in which Dr. DROR holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. DROR may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. DROR no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. DROR no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. DROR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical School, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Nov 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Sep 2001
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Sep 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Jul 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2005

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2004

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2001

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2000
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 1998
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 1995