THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:07:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 525 Park Road North
Brantford Ontario N3R 7K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 756-2512
Fax: (519) 756-3125
Address: 880 Upper Wentworth St
Hamilton Ontario L9H 5H2
Phone: 905-757-0808
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ali Hassan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Feb 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 525 Park Road North
Brantford Ontario N3R 7K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 756-2512
Fax: (519) 756-3125
Address: 880 Upper Wentworth St
Hamilton Ontario L9H 5H2
Phone: 905-757-0808
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ali Hassan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Feb 2022

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
23 Jun 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 23 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

As from June 23, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ali Nabeel Hassan, in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Hassan to the College
of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Hassan is prohibited from prescribing the following drugs, substances
and preparations set out in the corresponding regulations, as amended
from time to time, and summarized as follows:

Narcotic Drugs
(from the Narcotic Control Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs
and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19) Relinquished

Narcotic Preparations
(from the Narcotic Control Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs
and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19) Relinquished

Controlled Drugs
(from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
under the Food and Drugs
Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27) Relinquished

Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
(from the Benzodiazepines and Other
Targeted Substances Regulations made
under the Controlled Drugs and
Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19) Relinquished

All Other Monitored Drugs
(as defined under the Narcotic Safety and Relinquished
Awareness Act, S.O., 2010, c. 22)

Dr. Hassan shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all his
Practice Locations, which states as follows: "Dr. Hassan must not prescribe
Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and
other targeted substances, and/or all other Monitored Drugs. Further
information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
website at www.cpso.on.ca". The sign shall be translated into any language(s)
in which Dr. Hassan provides services and posted in the waiting rooms of all
his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible location.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

As from June 23, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ali Nabeel Hassan, in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Hassan to the College
of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Hassan is prohibited from prescribing the following drugs, substances
and preparations set out in the corresponding regulations, as amended
from time to time, and summarized as follows:

Narcotic Drugs
(from the Narcotic Control Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs
and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19) Relinquished

Narcotic Preparations
(from the Narcotic Control Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs
and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19) Relinquished

Controlled Drugs
(from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
under the Food and Drugs
Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27) Relinquished

Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
(from the Benzodiazepines and Other
Targeted Substances Regulations made
under the Controlled Drugs and
Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19) Relinquished

All Other Monitored Drugs
(as defined under the Narcotic Safety and Relinquished
Awareness Act, S.O., 2010, c. 22)

Dr. Hassan shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all his
Practice Locations, which states as follows: "Dr. Hassan must not prescribe
Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and
other targeted substances, and/or all other Monitored Drugs. Further
information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
website at www.cpso.on.ca". The sign shall be translated into any language(s)
in which Dr. Hassan provides services and posted in the waiting rooms of all
his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible location.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 23 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 11 Dec 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1995
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2003

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 1995