THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:00:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Asyut University, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2150 Robertson Rd
Unit 4
Nepean ON K2H 9S1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-482-0118
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Appletree Medical Centre
2150 Robertson Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 9S1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 368 Slater Street
Ottawa Ontario K1R 5C1
Phone: (613) 236-9441
Fax: (613) 236-9425
Address: appletree medical group
1595 merival clinic
Ottawa Ontario K2G 3J4
Phone: 613 224 2880
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emad Habib Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Sep 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Asyut University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2150 Robertson Rd
Unit 4
Nepean ON K2H 9S1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-482-0118
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Appletree Medical Centre
2150 Robertson Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 9S1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 368 Slater Street
Ottawa Ontario K1R 5C1
Phone: (613) 236-9441
Fax: (613) 236-9425
Address: appletree medical group
1595 merival clinic
Ottawa Ontario K2G 3J4
Phone: 613 224 2880
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emad Habib Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Sep 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMAD AYYAD HABIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABIB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMAD AYYAD HABIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABIB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Asyut University, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 1995