THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:36:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 31 Ste Marie Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 3J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 444-5695
Fax: (705) 444-6043

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 05 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site Meaford
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site
LOCATION: Meaford

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Akinyele Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Jul 2023

Corporation Name: Lisi and Akinyele Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 31 Ste Marie Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 3J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 444-5695
Fax: (705) 444-6043

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 05 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site Meaford
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site
LOCATION: Meaford

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Akinyele Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Jul 2023

Corporation Name: Lisi and Akinyele Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADEGBOYEGA ADEDAPO AKINYELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKINYELE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADEGBOYEGA ADEDAPO AKINYELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKINYELE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1996
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 1996