THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:27:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Origyns
1355 Bank St, Suite 205
Ottawa, Ontario
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2907
Fax: (613) 518-6555

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Origyns
1355 Bank St, Suite 205
Ottawa, Ontario
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2907
Fax: (613) 518-6555

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Executive Committee
06 May 2008
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Executive Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 06 2008
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from May 6, 2008, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Surreyya Yasmin Aziz:

Dr. Aziz is required to apply to the College of Physicians and Surgeons
of Ontario before commencing any practice in colposcopy.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from May 6, 2008, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Surreyya Yasmin Aziz:

Dr. Aziz is required to apply to the College of Physicians and Surgeons
of Ontario before commencing any practice in colposcopy.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee. Effective: 06 May 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1996
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 May 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 1996