THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:38:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1993
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cardiogenix Medical Centre
410-8250 Decarie Boulevard
Montreal Quebec H4P 2P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (514) 731-2491
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cardiogenix Medical Centre
410-8250 Decarie Boulevard
Montreal Quebec H4P 2P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (514) 731-2491
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHOK OOMMEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OOMMEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHOK OOMMEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OOMMEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 May 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 May 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 1996