THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:17:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 03 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Feb 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 May 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1996
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 1998

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 May 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 1996