THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:27:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 480 Huronia Road
Suite 205B
Barrie Ontario L4N 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-503-2553
Fax: 705-503-2552

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael L. Korkola Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Nov 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 480 Huronia Road
Suite 205B
Barrie Ontario L4N 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-503-2553
Fax: 705-503-2552

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael L. Korkola Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Nov 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL LORNE KORKOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KORKOLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL LORNE KORKOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KORKOLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On March 14, 2011, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Newmarket, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Korkola.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On March 14, 2011, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Newmarket, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Korkola.

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996