THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:55:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Univ of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 696 7286
Fax: (613) 696 7248

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Benjamin Chow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Nov 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Univ of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 696 7286
Fax: (613) 696 7248

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Benjamin Chow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Nov 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN JOE WADE CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN JOE WADE CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Apr 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996