THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:54:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 103E
4581 Highway 7
Unionville Ontario L3R 1M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 479-9693
Fax: (905) 415-1371
Address: Unit C216
777 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C8
Phone: (416) 977-8878
Fax: (416) 977-0118

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 15 Nov 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 103E
4581 Highway 7
Unionville Ontario L3R 1M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 479-9693
Fax: (905) 415-1371
Address: Unit C216
777 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C8
Phone: (416) 977-8878
Fax: (416) 977-0118

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 15 Nov 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YVONNE WAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YVONNE WAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996