THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:45:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FARSI, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medical Imaging
LHSC - University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 32894
Fax: (519) 663-8803

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 31 May 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roya Etemad-Rezai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Etemad-Rezai (CPSO#: 70024 )
Business Address: Department of Diagnostic Radiology and Nuclear Med
LHSC - University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3648

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FARSI, GERMAN
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medical Imaging
LHSC - University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 32894
Fax: (519) 663-8803

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 31 May 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roya Etemad-Rezai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Etemad-Rezai (CPSO#: 70024 )
Business Address: Department of Diagnostic Radiology and Nuclear Med
LHSC - University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3648

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROYA ETEMAD-REZAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ETEMAD-REZAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROYA ETEMAD-REZAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ETEMAD-REZAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996