THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:24:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: Tumber, Amanda Jane (Used Until: 12 Jul 1998)
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Medical Centre
Suite 214
6633 Highway 7
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 294-2290
Fax: (905) 294-0029
Address: 381 Church St.
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: 905 472 7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John R. Adams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Sep 2020

General Information

Former Name: Tumber, Amanda Jane (Used Until: 12 Jul 1998)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Medical Centre
Suite 214
6633 Highway 7
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 294-2290
Fax: (905) 294-0029
Address: 381 Church St.
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: 905 472 7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John R. Adams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Sep 2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANDA JANE ADAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAMS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANDA JANE ADAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAMS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996