THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:39:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: ErinoakKids
1230 Central Parkway West
Mississauga Ontario L5C 0A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 855-2690
Extension: 2469
Fax: 905-566-4606

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Developmental Pediatrics
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Developmental Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: ErinoakKids
1230 Central Parkway West
Mississauga Ontario L5C 0A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 855-2690
Extension: 2469
Fax: 905-566-4606

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Developmental Pediatrics
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Developmental Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LANA MAY WEAVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEAVER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LANA MAY WEAVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEAVER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996