THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 07:53:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C/O Durham Sports Centres
1883 Kingston Rd
Pickering Ontario L1V 1C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 428-9370
Fax: (905) 428-2396
Address: The Shoulder Centre
LH-Ajax hospital
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S2J4
Phone: 9054285313
Fax: 9054285339
Address: 2 Sheppard Ave E., # Suite 601
Toronto Ontario M2N 5Y7
Phone: (416) 223-7364
Fax: (416) 223-8048

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jason Wen-Shyang Su Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Nov 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C/O Durham Sports Centres
1883 Kingston Rd
Pickering Ontario L1V 1C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 428-9370
Fax: (905) 428-2396
Address: The Shoulder Centre
LH-Ajax hospital
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S2J4
Phone: 9054285313
Fax: 9054285339
Address: 2 Sheppard Ave E., # Suite 601
Toronto Ontario M2N 5Y7
Phone: (416) 223-7364
Fax: (416) 223-8048

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jason Wen-Shyang Su Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Nov 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON WEN-SHYANG SU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON WEN-SHYANG SU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996