THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:23:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2212 Grand Ravine Drive
Oakville Ontario L6H 6B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-502-4222
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Aberfoyle Clinic
Suite 406
1 Eva Road
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 4Z5
Phone: 416-231-7968
Fax: 416-231-7982

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Darlene Hall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Sep 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2212 Grand Ravine Drive
Oakville Ontario L6H 6B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-502-4222
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Aberfoyle Clinic
Suite 406
1 Eva Road
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 4Z5
Phone: 416-231-7968
Fax: 416-231-7982

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Darlene Hall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Sep 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARLENE VERA HALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARLENE VERA HALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996