THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 05:04:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 380 Burnham Street
Kawartha Urology
Ste 101
Peterborough Ontario K9H 1T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057436480
Fax: 7057436481

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 380 Burnham Street
Kawartha Urology
Ste 101
Peterborough Ontario K9H 1T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057436480
Fax: 7057436481

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTINA LYNN GARRELS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARRELS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTINA LYNN GARRELS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARRELS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2020
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 18 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996